Financial history FRIENDS OF THE BRADFORD ROYAL INFIRMARY

Charity number: 700416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £26.54k £11.57k £85 £3.47k £8.37k
Total expenditure £19.09k £4.92k £608 £1.81k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A