FRIENDS OF THE BRADFORD ROYAL INFIRMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of the B.RI. provide a range of services to supplement the work of the Hospital. This may take the form of financial help, providing for example items of medical equipment that are beyond the budget of an individual ward or department. The two Tea Bars provide refreshment for outpatients and visitors . Non-financial assistance is given on wards and clinics throughout the Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 07 March 1989: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hodgson | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.54k | £11.57k | £85 | £3.47k | £8.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.09k | £4.92k | £608 | £1.81k | £2.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED 11 OCTOBER 1990, 1 OCTOBER 1992 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADFORD ROYAL INFIRMARY
DUCKWORTH LANE
BRADFORD
BD9 6RJ
- Phone:
- 01274818270
- Email:
- jens11thousand@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window