ELSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 700420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes Economic/Community development/Employment in the village of Elsham in North Lincolnshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,666
Total expenditure: £4,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra Jane van Oosterhout Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
ROLAND GUEST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.02k £21.53k £11.41k £5.17k £6.67k
Total expenditure £3.73k £20.19k £3.64k £9.35k £4.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.57k £8.16k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Chapel Lane
Elsham
BRIGG
DN20 0RN
Phone:
01652680679
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available