Trustees LONG SUTTON AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 700438

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY ASHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joanna Birdseye | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Machin | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN HEARLE | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDY SADD | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|||||
WENDY JEFFRIES | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY NEWMAN-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE LOVEDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.