NEW PASTURE LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MULTI PURPOSE USE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £33,217 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 October 1988: Standard registration
- 16 November 2022: Funds received from 1038028 NEW PASTURE COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Robinson | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jade Ianson-Milner | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Walker | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Claire Gazeley | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.93k | £25.95k | £2.11k | £8.53k | £62.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £8.61k | £7.48k | £15.13k | £46.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.25k | N/A | N/A | £33.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 1988 AND LEASE DATED 9 JANUARY 1995.SCHEME OF 19TH FEBRUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEW PASTURE LANE HOUSING ESTATE BRIDLINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF HUMBERSIDE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF UMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NEW PASTURE LANE HOUSING ESTATE BRIDLINTON NORTH HUMBERSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Pasture Lane Community Centre
Burstall Hill
BRIDLINGTON
YO16 7NR
- Phone:
- 01262 679978
- Email:
- nplcommunitycentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window