WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chorley Women's Centre promotes the mental health and wellbeing of women in Chorley and surrounding areas. We provide a listening ear to drop in users, courses, information, self help groups, free counselling, and relaxation sessions.We are run by volunteers and open 2 days a week, and 1 day for DV Counselling Drop in users may go on to become volunteers and then on to the management committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £17,000 from 3 government contract(s) and £56,787 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 May 1989: Standard registration
- CHORLEY WOMEN'S CENTRE (Working name)
- THE CHORLEY WELL WOMEN CENTRE (Working name)
- WOMENS CENTRE (Working name)
- CHORLEY WELL WOMEN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Slater | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Anya Foley | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Carrington-Smith | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Keighley | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Simpson | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Faulkner | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HAGGARTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.01k | £64.30k | £58.19k | £87.26k | £109.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.64k | £43.89k | £67.00k | £78.46k | £80.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.79k | £13.75k | N/A | £15.00k | £17.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £48.78k | £53.42k | £66.12k | £56.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 SEPTEMBEG 1988
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF WOMET IN THE AREA OF CHORLEY AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
CHORLEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Clifford Street
Chorley
PR7 1SE
- Phone:
- 01257265342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window