Accounts and annual returns ELFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 700473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window