THE MELBOURNE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of the Christian faith. 2. The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress, or who are aged or sick. 3. The advancement of education on the basis of Christian principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 20 July 1988: Standard registration
- THE COMMUNITY CHURCH CHESTER (Working name)
- THE COMMUNITY CHURCH WREXHAM (Working name)
- NEW LIFE CHURCH WREXHAM (Previous name)
- THE COMMUNITY CHURCH, WREXHAM (Previous name)
- THE COMMUNITY CHURCHES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JOCELYN CLAIRE DILLAMORE | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|||||
MRS VERONIQUE MARGUERITE SUSSEX | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MARK DILLAMORE | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.52k | £19.95k | £5.32k | £9.91k | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £7.13k | £12.08k | £17.49k | £10.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 JUNE 1988 AS AMENDED 21 JANUARY 1999. AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Melbourne Centre
Melbourne Road
Blacon
CHESTER
CH1 5JQ
- Phone:
- 07803854188
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window