MIND IN BRADFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating in Bradford (West Yorks) we cover the Bradford Metrpolitan DC area. We are a user led organisation. We currently provide 3 Services. Guide-Line is a telephone information and support service open to anyone (including carers etc) 12-9pm 7 days a week. The other is a Drop-in service. This service is open to anyone and does not require a referral. Health & Wellbeing is an out reach service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 27 July 1988: Standard registration
- 13 November 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 November 2012: Funds transferred to 1142357 MIND IN BRADFORD
- "MIND" IN BRADFORD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £417.76k | £411.94k | £450.82k | £459.20k | £437.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.75k | £422.48k | £480.55k | £449.33k | £441.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 29 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 01 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 04 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 May 2010 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEATH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window