STAFFORD & RUGELEY UNIT 398 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Sea Cadet Corps (SCC) is to help young people towards responsible adulthood and to encourage them to reach their potential by developing valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct, using a nautical theme based on the customs and traditions of the Royal Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 August 1988: Standard registration
- T S SUPERB (Working name)
- T S SUPERB UNIT 398 (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Bailey | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bates | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | 01/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.09k | £7.21k | £8.52k | £7.90k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.64k | £9.89k | £10.59k | £13.71k | £12.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 27 November 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE TOWARDS RESPONSIBLE ADULTHOOD BY ENCOURAGING VALUABLE PERSONAL ATTRIBUTES AND HIGH STANDARDS OF CONDUCT, USING A NAUTICAL THEME BASED ON THE CUSTOMS OF THE ROYAL NAVY
Area of benefit
STAFFORD, RUGELEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stafford & Rugeley Sea Cadets
Riverway
STAFFORD
ST16 3TH
- Phone:
- 07432418221
- Email:
- sccenquiry@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window