SHREE SHREE RADHA KRISHNA CULTURAL CENTRE (COVENTRY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) Practice and promote Vedic Dharma (Religion) and the Vedic way of life pertaining to Shree Krishna and the Vaishnava renaissance era as described in the publications of the ISKCON. (2) Provide where possible relief to those in poverty or suffering from ill health or in need in some other way. (3) Support other charitable causes from time to time as approved by the management committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 08 August 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KUMAR KANUPARTI | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
RISHI KUMAR BHANDARI | Trustee | 06 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pargan Singh Samra | Trustee | 06 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIJAY VADUKUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARUN BHANDARI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.48k | £62.06k | £57.99k | £58.68k | £81.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.69k | £60.56k | £40.02k | £119.69k | £70.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2022 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AND VEDIC WAY OF LIFE PERTAINING TO SHREE KRISHNA AND RENAISSANCE ERA AS DESCRIBED IN THE PUBLICATIONS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNES. (B) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDIAN AND/OR VEDIC HISTORY, CULTURE, LANGUAGES. CUSTOMS AND WAY OF LIFE. (C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN POVERTY OR SUFFERING FROM ILL HEALTH, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OR GENERALLY BEING HANDICAPPED, UNDERPRIVILEGED OR IN NEED IN ANYWAY. (D) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AND THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GLOUCESTER STREET
COVENTRY
CV1 3BZ
- Phone:
- 07850658815
- Email:
- vjv108@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window