SHEPSHED AND DISTRICT STROKE AND HEART CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Club was dissolved in December 2012. Funds were kept by Trustees until December 2014 after which they were transferred to other groups of a similar nature. All this was reported to the Charities Commission on 12. February 2015 at 16:41 by digital transfer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 11 August 1988: Standard registration
- 03 June 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- SHEPSHED AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.52k | £6.51k | £3.06k | £11 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.70k | £5.59k | £4.19k | £1.84k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 18 May 2016 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 04 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/06/1988 AS AMENDED ON 15/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF A STROKE, HEART FAILURE OR OTHER DISABILITY ARISING FROM A LONG TERM CONDITION.
Area of benefit
SHEPSHED AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window