Financial history ROGER SAWREY'S BEQUEST

Charity number: 700555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.43k £5.76k £4.65k £4.74k £4.82k
Total expenditure £4.05k £1.78k £3.41k £6.40k £7.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A