THE BISHOP'S DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support locally based projects where mission is the keynote of church life. To encourage congregational growth, initiatives to attract and retain young people and community outreach projects. To support initiatives which encourage working across parish boundaries and environmental & "green" community issues. Including funding for gap year students or pastoral assistants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Kirklees
Governance
- 18 August 1988: Standard registration
- BISHOP'S CENTENARY FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Venerable Catherine Mary Thatcher | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Keith Andrew Victor Liddle | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable William Edward Braviner | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Matthew Ambler | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Baines | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CHRISTINE BYRAM | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|||||
BRIAN PEARSON | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Margaret Morton | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.70k | £32.13k | £63.03k | £33.53k | £32.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.02k | £51.51k | £63.68k | £73.24k | £75.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1995 BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREAS OF THE SAID DIOCESE OF WAKEFIELD WHICH ARE IN NEED OF SPIRITUAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CHANGES WITH A VIEW TO REINFORCING THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AMONG THE PEOPLE OF THOSE AREAS. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH URBAN FUND.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF WAKEFIELD AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BISHOP'S AREA OFFICE
Thornes Park Campus
Thornes Park
WAKEFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF2 8QZ
- Phone:
- 01924250781
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window