SPRING BANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of all inhabitants of the Spring Bank Area without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the local authorities, and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities for the common benefit of said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 30 August 1988: Standard registration
- SPRINGBANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- SPRING BANK SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina Coyle | Chair | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Muflahi | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Moor | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Moore | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hanadelnil Mustafa | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.56k | £96.47k | £86.63k | £67.93k | £51.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.44k | £57.27k | £101.49k | £67.99k | £60.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £32.59k | £8.04k | £1.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTUTION ADOPTED 10TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 20TH AUGUST 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SPRING BANK SOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAINAND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (AREA OF BENEFIT : SPRING BANK AREA AS DEFINED BY FERENSWAY AND BEVERLEY ROAD TO THE EAST, THE REDUNDANT RAILWAY LINE TO THE NORTH AND WEST AND THE ACTIVE RAILWAY LINE TO THE SOUTH)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPRING BANK COMMUNITY CENTRE
WEST PARADE
SPRING BANK
HULL
HU3 1BX
- Phone:
- 01482323483
- Email:
- contact@sbca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window