GRIMSBY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide HBO treatment for MS sufferers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 August 1989: Standard registration
- 06 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HUMBERSIDE AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE FRIENDS OF ARMS LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £11.63k | £14.04k | £12.52k | £6.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.02k | £18.07k | £15.14k | £14.86k | £14.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 16 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 06 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 28 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 19 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 19 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 APRIL 1988 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO AID AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREAS OF SCUNTHORPE,GRIMSBY, HULL AND THE COUNTY OF HUMBERSIDE OR SUCH OTHER PART OR PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS. (2) TO ASSIST ARMS (MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS RESEARCH) LTD IN PROMOTING (WHETHER OR NOT WITHIN THE AREA BENEFIT) ALL OR ANY OF ITS OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window