Linked charities KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL STAFFORD AMENITIES AND PRIZES FUND
Charity number: 700640

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
- CLAUDIUS MILES AVERILL ENDOWMENT
- CLAUDIUS MILES AVERILL ENDOWMENT
- KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL PRIZES FUND
- KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL STAFFORD AMENITIES AND PRIZES FUND
- THE ASTON/BRADSTON PRIZE
- THE DONALD PRICE MEMORIAL FUND
- THE LILIAN WHITEHURST MEMORIAL PRIZE
- THE NICHOLSON PRIZE
- THE PARENTS PRIZES FOR ENGLISH
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 NOVEMBER 1984.AS AMENDED ON 4 MARCH 2002 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME ON MAKING AWARDS OF MONEY OR IN KIND TO PUPILS OF THE KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL, STAFFORD, IN FURTHERANCE OF FIELD STUDIES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES MADE FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 September 1988 : Standard registration
- 01 September 1997 : Standard registration
- 01 September 1997 : Removed
- 23 August 2002 : Removed
- 23 August 2002 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.