ECHO CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 October 1988: Standard registration
- 29 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EASTFIELD COMMUNITY HELP ORGANISATION (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER POINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE- TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY, SOCIAL WELFARE AND ADVICE CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMISED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
EASTFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window