THE ST SWITHIN'S HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Hire/provide rooms, garden, accommodation for church and/ or parish groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 29 September 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Stuart Christopher Dimes | Chair | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Spencer Scriven | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Holt | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Nicholas Parker | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANTONIA DAYMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES JUKES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.27k | £12.29k | £8.28k | £23.05k | £19.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.73k | £14.59k | £10.26k | £12.29k | £18.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. B) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR USE BY THE PAROCHIAN CHURCH COUNCIL OF BARSTON IN THE DIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM AS A CHURCH HALL AND THE GROUNDS FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE SAID PARISH OF BARSTON. C) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION FOR CONFERENCES AND MEETINGS HELD FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BARSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LEYMERE CLOSE
MERIDEN
COVENTRY
CV7 7SB
- Phone:
- 01676523951
- Email:
- theb4rn@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window