Financial history CHECKLEY PARISH COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 700668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £42.60k £20.43k £41.80k £30.08k £42.88k
Total expenditure £57.33k £11.73k £56.85k £20.81k £34.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £10.00k £24.77k £800 N/A