Financial history THE SOCIETY OF PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER

Charity Number: 700684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.70k £61 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.11k £2.88k £22.88k £2.19k £2.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A