NORTH STAINLEY SPORT AND RECREATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity, is in the interests of social welfare, the provision & maintenance of a village hall & recreation ground for use by the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions, incl. meetings, lectures & classes, and other forms of recreation & leisure-time occupation, improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- NORTH STAINLEY RECREATIONAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Maisey | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Taylor | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Gabriel | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Winkle | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McGavin | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Bailey | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.59k | £55.77k | £45.18k | £44.47k | £56.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.75k | £34.76k | £41.08k | £92.66k | £66.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 01 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUNDS FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH STAINLEY WITH SLENINGFORD AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
- 28 March 1989 : Standard registration
- 03 March 2003 : Removed
- 03 March 2003 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Stainley Village Hall
The Square
North Stainley
North Yorkshire
HG4 3JT
- Phone:
- 01765 635024
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window