Accounts and annual returns THE SAMANTHA AND LUCY CHARITY (BARNSLEY)

Charity Number: 700722
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
Annual return 30 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 628 days
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 628 days
Annual return 30 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 993 days
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 993 days
Annual return 30 October 2020 03 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 03 July 2021 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required