Accounts and annual returns BREAKTHRO' LLANELLI

Charity number: 700776
Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days