THE YORK MERCHANT ADVENTURERS 1988 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education generally with particular emphasis on support and promotion of Enterprise Education in schools. Other charitable purposes as determined by the Court of Assistants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 November 1988: Standard registration
- THE 1988 TRUST (Working name)
- THE YORK MERCHANT ADVENTURES 1988 CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COMPANY OF MERCHANT ADVENTURERS OF THE CITY OF YORK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.95k | £17.59k | £32.18k | £44.11k | £60.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.74k | £22.84k | £8.52k | £36.46k | £60.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MAY 1988
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND MORE PARTICULARLY ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF COMMERCIAL AND INDUSTRIAL ORGANISATIONS AND ACTIVITIES; AND 2) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COURT OF ASSISTANTS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERCHANT ADVENTURERS HALL
FOSSGATE
YORK
YO1 9XD
- Phone:
- 01904654818
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window