DEIGHTON VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs and operates the village hall in Deighton, North Yorkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 November 1988: Standard registration
- DEIGHTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Charles Williams | Chair | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Nesbit | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Henry | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ALEXANDER JAMES WATSON | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £985 | £985 | £2.01k | £2.82k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £1.16k | £1.11k | £2.18k | £1.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 20 OCTOBER 1988.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHAITANTS WITHIN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL. RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DEIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
DEIGHTON
NORTHALLERTON
DL6 2SJ
- Phone:
- 01609882153
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window