Accounts and annual returns NORTHERN COLLEGE OF HOMEOPATHIC MEDICINE

Charity number: 700795
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 13 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 11 April 2011 On Time