NORTHERN COLLEGE OF HOMEOPATHIC MEDICINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING 4 YR PROFESSIONAL HOMEOPATHY COURSE Running low cost clinics in homeopathy Homeopathy clinic
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 03 November 1988: Standard registration
- 03 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.73k | £111.57k | £124.11k | £66.72k | £87.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.45k | £116.26k | £141.75k | £84.50k | £105.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 13 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 11 April 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE COLLEGE AND PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF STUDY, TEACHING AND RESEARCH INTO THE KNOWLEDGE BOTH CLINICAL AND MEDICAL OF HOMEOPATHIC MEDICINE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGOM AND THE DISSEMINATION AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window