BRIDLINGTON TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Production and recording of spoken news items from local papers/magazines for distribution on memory sticks for people with sight disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 January 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS SLINGSBY | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rhoderick Watson | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alyn Jones | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Burnett | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Houlton-Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Shepherd | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE VERNON | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVE VERNON | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS SHILLADAY | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH NIXON | Trustee | 27 August 1997 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA SLINGSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91k | £1.04k | £425 | £146 | £14.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £709 | £507 | £696 | £1.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY O PERMANET INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES OR TACTILE READING MATTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Cedar Court
BRIDLINGTON
YO16 6ZQ
- Phone:
- 01262602484
- Email:
- KEN.NIXON1940@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window