THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE SHELDON NURSING HOME

Charity number: 700858
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funding for improvements to the amenities for the benefit of patients, relatives & staff.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £13,032
Total expenditure: £21,007

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF THE SHELDON (Working name)
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF JOSEPH SHELDON HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYDIA DYSON Chair 10 September 2013
None on record
MRS J M SMITH Trustee
None on record
PAT JOSEPHINE MCALLISTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £4.17k £5.28k £8.52k £16.51k £13.03k
Total expenditure £5.50k £5.01k £9.42k £7.67k £21.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 STRONSAY CLOSE
RUBERY
REDNAL
BIRMINGHAM
B45 0HW
Phone:
01214756100
Website:

No information available