CROSBY RAVENSWORTH UNITED SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to administer and manage Crosby Ravensworth United Schools Foundation maintain charity owned properties consider and issue grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW STEPHEN CLEMENT | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA SIMPSON | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILLIAN HEWITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.67k | £16.79k | £16.98k | £16.70k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.76k | £6.82k | £5.37k | £10.50k | £4.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 20 JULY 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SCHOOL WHICH SHALL BE CONDUCTED AS A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL. TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN 1) ASSISTING THE GOVERNORS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SCHOOL TO DEFRAY THE COST OF MEETING THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1986. 2) A) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AT THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL AND THE GOVERNORS. B) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ATTENDING, OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTEND THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bank Head
Crosby Ravensworth
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA10 3JB
- Phone:
- 01931715243
- Email:
- dalriada1@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window