NEURO THERAPY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 700904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing therapeutic support,advice and services to individuals with neurological conditions, their families and Carers, in Cheshire, North Wales, Merseyside and the Wirral.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • M S SUPPORT CENTRE (Working name)
  • CHESTER AND NORTH WALES FRIENDS OF ARMS LIMITED (Previous name)
  • MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SUPPORT CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORRAINE ANTONIA CARROL DODD Chair 03 July 2015
CAREER CONNECT
Received: On time
Paul Crossland Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Michael Martin Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Dr David James Purdell-Lewis Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Norman Charles Holladay Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Dr Hilary Harris Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Derek William Sanders Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record
JUDITH LOUISE ECCLESTON Trustee 04 July 2014
None on record
JOHN CHARLES BRIERLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £542.43k £594.78k £487.46k £671.08k £778.41k
Total expenditure £560.00k £540.38k £520.05k £598.53k £727.80k
Income from government contracts N/A £119.49k £119.49k £119.49k £119.49k
Income from government grants £198.86k £67.90k £74.40k £67.43k £83.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £41.51k £51.66k N/A £192.22k £163.16k
Income - Other trading activities £36.62k £19.30k N/A £37.60k £46.02k
Income - Charitable activities £462.79k £521.94k N/A £404.02k £564.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.51k £1.88k N/A £2.66k £5.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £34.58k £0
Income - Legacies £2.83k £4.29k N/A £2.56k £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £516.03k £502.73k N/A £587.99k £688.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.98k £37.65k N/A £9.41k £27.56k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.59k N/A £3.10k £3.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £1.13k £11.40k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £113.67k £116.69k N/A £137.57k £210.89k
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Other assets £346.05k £409.40k N/A £440.10k £399.94k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £27.03k £39.01k N/A £50.62k £33.17k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIT C4
BRYMAU ONE ESTATE
RIVER LANE
SALTNEY
CHESTER
CH4 8RG
Phone:
01244678619