THE SAINT MARY MAGDALENE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees shall have power to hold IN TRUST Properties and Monies for the benefit of the Parish Church of St Mary Magdalene, Fleet. Income shall be invested as CAPITAL and the INTEREST ONLY shall be used as the need arises to assist the day to day running costs of the church, or repair and restoration work that needs to be carried out upon and within the church & churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 November 1988: Standard registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER EPHRAIM COUPLAND | Chair | 15 July 2011 |
|
|||||
Sue Taylor | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bush | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
JANE ROWNA KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HARVEY FRISBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £3.68k | £3.74k | £3.91k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £3.11k | £2.16k | £4.28k | £8.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME THEREOF FOR THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, AND RESTORATION OF THE FURNISHINGS AND FITTINGS WITHIN THE CHURCH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, FLEET, THE STRUCTURE OF THE BUILDING (ITS WALLS AND ROOFS) THE CHURCHYARD AND THE CHURCHYARD WALL AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP WITHIN THE SAID CHURCH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION WITHIN THE PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, FLEET, IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, FLEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawsmere House
Dawsmere Bank
Dawsmere
Spalding
PE12 9NN
- Phone:
- 01406550307
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window