CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a short summer holiday for inner-city children who are in genuine need of the experience; to allow children to experience a holiday and to provide relief to their families/carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 26 July 1989: Standard registration
- 06 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £3.20k | £3.70k | £3.27k | £2.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.49k | £2.27k | £2.65k | £2.24k | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 26 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 January 2020 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS: TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR CHILDREN (HERE MEANING PERSONS OF ANY RACE, NATIONALITY, CREED OR COLOUR WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 18 YEARS) FROM THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, SUCH CHILDREN HAVING NEED OF SUCH HOLIDAYS BY REASON OF IMFIMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window