Financial history BANGLADESH WOMENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.98k £68.82k £60.19k £51.46k £45.53k
Total expenditure £65.78k £65.54k £72.10k £45.76k £44.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.63k
Income from government grants £30.18k £54.55k £15.82k £9.38k N/A