BANGLADESH WOMENS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education and employment training facilities to women, provision of creche' facilities for mothers who attend the courses, organising employment and self emplyment related seminars and running a youth centre for young girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,625 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 November 1988: Standard registration
- BANGLADESH WOMENS EMPLOYMENT RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowshon Ara Malik | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eba Pasha | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAHEEDA CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS KOLPANA BEGUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALIKA BEGUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAHMINA ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.98k | £68.82k | £60.19k | £51.46k | £45.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.78k | £65.54k | £72.10k | £45.76k | £44.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.18k | £54.55k | £15.82k | £9.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 4. EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
THE MIDLANDS WITHIN A 50 MILE RADIS OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
497 COVENTRY ROAD
SMALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0JS
- Phone:
- 01217667990
- Email:
- bwaamina@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window