NORTH SOMERCOTES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of land held in trust, for the benefit of North Somercotes Church of England Primary School, to further and enhance the provision of facilities available at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 November 1988: Standard registration
- SCHOOL TRUSTEES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER LESLIE DAVEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michelle Rowell | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Daniel McNally | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Arundel | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERNARD ROWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY LIBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £1.60k | £1.60k | £18.14k | £1.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2022 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 August 2022 | 643 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE BY THE BOARD OF EDUCATION 26 APRIL 1906 AND SCHEME OF 26 AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
(1) PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE SAID TRUSTEES AND THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY (2) 2N PROMOTING IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SAID TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (3) IN PROMOTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE SAID TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE SCHOOL OR WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF NORTH SOMERCOTES AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NORTH SOMERCOTES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highfield Lodge
Bank End
North Somercotes
South Somercotes
LOUTH
LN11 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01507358446
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window