Financial history Bradshaw Primary School Parent Teacher Association

Charity Number: 700941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £9.02k £1.80k £6.48k £6.71k
Total expenditure £3.10k £4.31k £4.07k £4.87k £5.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A