Governing document Bradshaw Primary School Parent Teacher Association
Charity Number: 700941

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/01/1988 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2011 as amended on 26 Sep 2023 as amended on 01 Apr 2024 as amended on 01 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.