Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRADWELL HOSPITAL

Charity number: 700946
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 14 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 01 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 01 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 15 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 15 October 2004 On Time