HELIX ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the general public in the arts, especially by enabling members of the public to work alongside artists producing works of high artistic class, and by the fostering and promotion of the participation in the arts within the North East region to address issues of social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 December 1988: Standard registration
- ARTISTS AGENCY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON SHAW | Chair | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annie Latham | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronan Devlin | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Lawrence | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Daniel Buckley | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Steggles | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alex Shiel | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £314.11k | £264.61k | £387.01k | £263.28k | £476.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.94k | £183.11k | £317.74k | £278.86k | £383.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 25TH NOVEMBER 1988, 24 NOVEMBER 2003, 27 NOVEMBER 2006. as amended on 01 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS ESPECIALLY BY ENABLING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO WORK ALONGSIDE ARTISTS PRODUCING WORKS OF HIGH ARTISTIC CLASS,AND BY FOSTERING AND PROMOTION OF THE PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS (INCLUDING BY WAY OF EXAMPLE ONLY AND NOT OF LIMITATION THE ARTS OF DRAMA,MIME,DANCE,SINGING,MUSIC,POETRY,LITERATURE,PHOTOGRAPHY,FILM AND VISUAL ARTS)AND AN AWARENESS,KNOWLEDGE,UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE OF THE NORTHERN AREA.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54A Saville Street
NORTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE30 1NT
- Phone:
- 01912414931
- Email:
- info@helixarts.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window