Financial history FRIENDS OF SOUTHLANDS SCHOOL

Charity Number: 700958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.00k £2.09k £1.37k £1.10k £6.13k
Total expenditure £3.08k £3.51k £3.19k £1.12k £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A