WOODHOUSE FAMILY ADVICE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 December 1988: Standard registration
- 23 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.00k | £113.35k | £76.70k | £76.25k | £52.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.00k | £117.22k | £71.33k | £77.85k | £64.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 April 2013 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 28 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5.12.88
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOODHOUSE SEACLIFFE KELLS AND GREENBANK IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNATARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY ANDTO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
WOODHOUSE, GREENBANK, SEACLIFF AND KELLS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window