NEWARK AND SHERWOOD COMMUNITY HUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newark and Sherwood Community Hub is one of six play forums in Nottinghamshire which promote, develop and support childrens play, we also run Millgate Community Centre which supports our local community providing a low cost venue for groups to come together, learn new skills and socialise in a warm safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Total income includes £35,101 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- NEWARK PLAY PROJECT (Working name)
- NEWARK AND SHERWOOD PLAY SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.83k | £108.20k | £89.99k | £57.68k | £62.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.99k | £109.00k | £90.07k | £62.21k | £61.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.00k | £37.65k | £27.42k | £35.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 01 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 01 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 30 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED ON 19 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY FUTHERING THE DEVELOPMENT OF PLAY FACILITIES AND PLAY OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, BY CO-ORDINAING LOCAL PLAY FORUMS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL STUTUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPAION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NEWARK AND SHERWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window