NEWSONG COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith and the worship of God in the County of Worcestershire and elsewhere
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 December 1988: Standard registration
- NEWSONG COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- BROMSGROVE CHRISTIAN CHURCH (Previous name)
- BROMSGROVE CHURCH OF CHRIST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adeniyi Adetoki | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Last | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martha SIMWANZA | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Poole | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Wright | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.39k | £73.92k | £88.14k | £96.07k | £97.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.50k | £79.11k | £102.84k | £90.48k | £110.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTER AND ELSEWHERE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
BROMSGROVE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broad Street
BROMSGROVE
B61 8LW
- Phone:
- 01527575497
- Email:
- newsong.bromsgrove@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window