Financial history THE BIRMINGHAM CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 701067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £54.18k £19.99k £32.55k £39.73k £63.81k
Total expenditure £39.55k £30.75k £34.94k £52.89k £62.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A