THE BIRMINGHAM CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of tuition of the Chinese language
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 09 March 1989: Standard registration
- 03 October 2022: Funds received from 1138961 UK CHINESE EDUCATION FOUNDATION LIMITED
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yim Tung Wong | Chair | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wai Lun Pang | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kwok Wai Yau | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hui Hoang Lam | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yan Xia Li | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMY CHING WAN LI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.18k | £19.99k | £32.55k | £39.73k | £63.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.55k | £30.75k | £34.94k | £52.89k | £62.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 26 AUGUST, 1, 16 + 19 DECEMBER 1988, 3 JANUARY 1989, 20 FEBRUARY 1989, 14 AUGUST 1991 AND 15 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY ; 1) PROMOTING THE TEACHING OF THE CHINESE LANGUAGE IN BOTH THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN FORM AMONGST CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF SIXTEEN. 2) PROMOTING AN INCREASE IN THE KNOWLEDGE,UNDERSTANDING AD APPRECIATION OF CHINESE HISTORY,CULTURE AND HERITAGE AMONGST CHILDREN. 3) PROMOTING THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5/F
ALBANY HOUSE
31 HURST STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B5 4BD
- Phone:
- 07876634538
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window