Governing document THE BIRMINGHAM CHINESE SCHOOL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 26 AUGUST, 1, 16 + 19 DECEMBER 1988, 3 JANUARY 1989, 20 FEBRUARY 1989, 14 AUGUST 1991 AND 15 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY ; 1) PROMOTING THE TEACHING OF THE CHINESE LANGUAGE IN BOTH THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN FORM AMONGST CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF SIXTEEN. 2) PROMOTING AN INCREASE IN THE KNOWLEDGE,UNDERSTANDING AD APPRECIATION OF CHINESE HISTORY,CULTURE AND HERITAGE AMONGST CHILDREN. 3) PROMOTING THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.