PARISH OF BOLTON-LE-SANDS - VILLAGE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 701068
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recreational area for the community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BOLTON-LE-SANDS PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 05 June 2023 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 05 June 2023 489 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 05 June 2023 854 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 THE SHORE
BOLTON LE SANDS
CARNFORTH
LA5 8JR
Phone:
01524825263
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available