Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE MALTINGS (BERWICK-UPON-TWEED)

Charity Number: 701069
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 October 2008 On Time